ME LD1207 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to Implement the Recommendations of the Right To Know Advisory Committee Concerning Public Records Exceptions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act to Implement the Recommendations of the Right To Know Advisory Committee Concerning Public Records Exceptions

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-25SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2023-05-23HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-05-23HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2023-05-18SenateOrdered sent down forthwith
2023-05-18SenateREAD A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence.
2023-05-18SenateCOMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED.
2023-05-16SenateASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
2023-05-16SenateREAD ONCE
2023-05-16SenateOn motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence
2023-05-16SenateReports Read
2023-05-11HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-05-11HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
2023-05-11HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2023-05-11HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2023-05-11HouseOn motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
2023-05-11HouseReports READ.
2023-05-09JointReported Out: OTP/ONTP
2023-04-13JointVoted: Divided Report
2023-04-13JointWork Session Held
2023-03-30HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594.
2023-03-21SenateOn motion by Senator Carney of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on Judiciary and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence.
2023-03-21SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2023-03-16HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-03-16HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY
2023-03-16HouseReport was READ and ACCEPTED.
2023-03-16HouseRepresentative MOONEN for the Joint Standing Committee on Judiciary pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 1, section 411, subsection 6, paragraph G reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback