ME LD1206 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding the Terms of Office of the Director of the Maine State Museum Commission, the State Librarian and the Director of the Maine Arts Commission
Title
An Act Regarding the Terms of Office of the Director of the Maine State Museum Commission, the State Librarian and the Director of the Maine Arts Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-02-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-02-23 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-02-16 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-02-16 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2022-02-16 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-02-16 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-02-16 | House | On motion of Representative BRENNAN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-02-16 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED |
2022-02-10 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-02-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York The Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Reports READ |
2022-02-09 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP/ONTP |
2022-02-02 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-02-02 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2021-04-21 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on March 22, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |