ME LD1197 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Amend the Law Prohibiting the Denial by Health Insurers of Referrals by Out-of-network Providers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend the Law Prohibiting the Denial by Health Insurers of Referrals by Out-of-network Providers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-05-21HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-21HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-05-16HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-16HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-90).
2019-05-16HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2019-05-16HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2019-05-14SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2019-05-14SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-90).
2019-05-14SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-90) READ and ADOPTED.
2019-05-14SenateREAD ONCE.
2019-05-14SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED.
2019-03-12HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-03-12HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES.
2019-03-12SenateCommittee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback