ME LD1193 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Encourage Good Nutrition and Healthy Choices in the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program
Title
An Act To Encourage Good Nutrition and Healthy Choices in the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #302 (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-23 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2015-06-23 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-23 | House | On motion of Representative GIDEON of Freeport the Bill and accompanying papers were INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. |
2015-06-23 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2015-06-22 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-19 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-19 | House | Later today assigned. |
2015-06-19 | House | On motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 302 20 Yeas - 14 Nays- 1 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Subsequently, On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President ProTem |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-10 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator, TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending his motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2015-04-02 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-02 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | On motion by Senator Brakey of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2015-04-01 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |