ME LD1191 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Remove the Municipal Mandate To Enforce the Maine Uniform Building and Energy Code
Title
An Act To Remove the Municipal Mandate To Enforce the Maine Uniform Building and Energy Code
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Thibodeau [R] | Sen. Andre Cushing [R] | Sen. Paul Davis [R] | Sen. Amy Volk [R] |
Rep. Beth Turner [R] | Rep. Karleton Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - House - Recede And Concur RC #294 (Y: 72 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2015-06-17 - Senate - Adopt Sas-297 To Cas-161 RC #285 (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-12 - House - Acc Min Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #232 (Y: 79 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #207 (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Senate - Adopt Sas-297 To Cas-161 RC #285 (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-12 - House - Acc Min Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #232 (Y: 79 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #207 (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2015-06-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland The Senate INSISTED To PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-161) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-297) thereto , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2015-06-18 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-18 | House | Subsequently, the House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2015-06-18 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 294 (Yeas 72 - Nays 72 - Absent 7 - Excused 0) |
2015-06-18 | House | Motion of Representative HIGGINS of Dover-Foxcroft to RECEDE and CONCUR FAILED. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-161) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-297) thereto , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECEDED From ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-161) , in NON-CONCURRENCE. On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-297) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-161) READ and ADOPTED Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 285 21 Yeas - 13 Nays- 1 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED Committee Amendment "A" (S-161) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-297) thereto ADOPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis The Senate RECEDED From PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-161) , in concurrence. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-15 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION Unfinished Business |
2015-06-15 | Senate | RECONSIDER whereby the Senate INSISTED to ACCEPTANCE of the Majority OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-161) |
2015-06-15 | Senate | The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of the Minority OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-161) , in NON-CONCURRENCE |
2015-06-12 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-12 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2015-06-12 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 232 (Yeas 79 - Nays 59 - Absent 13 - Excused 0) |
2015-06-12 | House | On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2015-06-12 | House | Later today assigned. |
2015-06-12 | House | On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-161) |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-161) READ and ADOPTED |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President ProTem Subsequently, On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 207 19 Yeas - 14 Nays- 2 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED READ ONCE |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending Motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Senator VOLK of Cumberland moved to Accept the Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Reports READ |
2015-04-02 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-02 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | On motion by Senator Volk of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT |
2015-04-01 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT |