ME LD1186 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-25 - FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-25 - FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Department of Inland Fisheries and Wildlife to Develop a Hunting and Fishing Software Application
Title
Resolve, Directing the Department of Inland Fisheries and Wildlife to Develop a Hunting and Fishing Software Application
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-25 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED in concurrence |
2023-07-25 | Senate | On Motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2023-06-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINALLY PASSED in concurrence |
2023-06-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-13 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2023-06-12 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-12 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-214). |
2023-06-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2023-06-12 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-214). |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-214) READ and ADOPTED. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-07 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2023-05-10 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2023-05-10 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-04-26 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-16 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-16 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |