ME LD1181 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Reduce Electricity Costs through Nonwires Alternatives

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Reduce Electricity Costs through Nonwires Alternatives

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-05HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-05HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-04SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2019-06-04SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-431), in concurrence.
2019-06-04SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-431) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-04SenateREAD ONCE.
2019-06-04SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-04HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-04HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-431).
2019-06-04HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2019-06-04HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2019-03-12SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY in concurrence
2019-03-12HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-03-12HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY.
2019-03-12HouseCommittee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback