ME LD1176 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Improve Fairness in Auto Insurance Claims

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Improve Fairness in Auto Insurance Claims

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-07SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2021-06-03HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-03HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2021-06-02SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-178) in concurrence
2021-06-02SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-178) READ and ADOPTED
2021-06-02SenateREAD ONCE
2021-06-02SenateOn motion by Senator SANBORN of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
2021-06-02SenateReports Read
2021-05-19HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-05-19HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-178).
2021-05-19HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2021-05-19HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-178) was READ and ADOPTED.
2021-05-19HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2021-05-19HouseOn motion of Representative TEPLER of Topsham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2021-05-19HouseReports READ.
2021-05-17JointReported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
2021-04-13JointVoted: Divided Report
2021-04-13JointWork Session Held
2021-03-30HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
2021-03-18HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
2021-03-18HouseReceived by the Clerk of the House on March 18, 2021.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback