ME LD1171 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Raise Funding to Support Waste Reduction, Reuse, Recycling and Composting in Maine
Title
An Act to Raise Funding to Support Waste Reduction, Reuse, Recycling and Composting in Maine
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-05-01 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2023-04-27 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2023-04-27 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES in concurrence |
2023-03-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-16 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1171&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0743&item=1&snum=131 |