ME LD1171 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Curtail No-knock Warrants

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Curtail No-knock Warrants

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2021-06-14HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-14HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2021-06-14SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2021-06-14SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-536), in concurrence.
2021-06-14SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-536) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2021-06-14SenateREAD ONCE.
2021-06-14SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2021-06-10HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-10HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-536).
2021-06-10HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2021-06-10HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2021-06-09JointReported Out: OTP-AM
2021-05-12JointVoted: OTP-AM
2021-05-12JointWork Session Held
2021-05-03JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2021-03-30HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
2021-03-18HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
2021-03-18HouseReceived by the Clerk of the House on March 18, 2021.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback