ME LD1171 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 102-22-4-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 8 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Prevent Sexual and Domestic Violence and To Support Survivors

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Prevent Sexual and Domestic Violence and To Support Survivors

Sponsors

Sen. Erin Herbig [D]Rep. Kent Ackley [I]Rep. Robert Alley [D]Rep. Betty Austin [D]
Rep. Christopher Babbidge [D]Rep. Shawn Babine [D]Rep. Donna Bailey [D]Rep. Pinny Beebe-Center [D]
Sen. Shenna Bellows [D]Rep. Seth Berry [D]Sen. Russell Black [R]Rep. Lydia Blume [D]
Sen. Catherine Breen [D]Rep. Michael Brennan [D]Rep. Heidi Brooks [D]Rep. Mark Bryant [D]
Rep. Barbara Cardone [D]Rep. Anne Carney [D]Sen. Michael Carpenter [D]Sen. Everett Carson [D]
Sen. Justin Chenette [D]Sen. Benjamin Chipman [D]Sen. Ned Claxton [D]Rep. Kristen Cloutier [D]
Rep. Benjamin Collings [D]Rep. Janice Cooper [D]Rep. Patrick Corey [R]Rep. Margaret Craven [D]
Rep. Edward Crockett [D]Rep. Scott Cuddy [D]Sen. Scott Cyrway [R]Rep. Matthea Larsen Daughtry [D]
Sen. Paul Davis [R]Rep. Diane Denk [D]Rep. Dale Denno [D]Sen. Susan Deschambault [D]
Rep. Michael Devin [D]Sen. William Diamond [D]Sen. James Dill [D]Rep. Kathleen Dillingham [R]
Rep. Janice Dodge [D]Rep. Donna Doore [D]Rep. Victoria Doudera [D]Sen. Dana Dow [R]
Rep. Michelle Dunphy [D]Rep. Jeffrey Evangelos [I]Rep. Richard Farnsworth [D]Sen. Bradlee Farrin [R]
Rep. Jessica Fay [D]Rep. Ryan Fecteau [D]Sen. Robert Foley [R]Rep. Andrew Gattine [D]
Rep. Sara Gideon [D]Rep. Lori Gramlich [D]Sen. Geoffrey Gratwick [D]Rep. Abigail Griffin [R]
Rep. Nicole Grohoski [D]Sen. Stacey Guerin [R]Rep. James Handy [D]Rep. Sheldon Hanington [R]
Rep. Thomas Harnett [D]Rep. Frances Head [R]Rep. Allison Hepler [D]Rep. Craig Hickman [D]
Rep. Daniel Hobbs [D]Rep. Brian Hubbell [D]Rep. Patricia Hymanson [D]Rep. Henry Ingwersen [D]
Sen. Troy Jackson [D]Rep. Erik Jorgensen [D]Sen. Lisa Keim [R]Rep. Dennis Keschl [R]
Rep. Maryanne Kinney [R]Rep. Victoria Kornfield [D]Rep. Scott Landry [D]Sen. Mark Lawrence [D]
Sen. Nathan Libby [D]Sen. Louis Luchini [D]Rep. Colleen Madigan [D]Rep. John Martin [D]
Rep. Anne-Marie Mastraccio [D]Rep. Ann Matlack [D]Rep. Chloe Maxmin [D]Rep. David McCrea [D]
Rep. Joyce McCreight [D]Rep. Genevieve McDonald [D]Rep. Andrew McLean [D]Rep. Gina Melaragno [D]
Rep. Michele Meyer [D]Sen. Rebecca Millett [D]Sen. David Miramant [D]Rep. Matthew Moonen [D]
Sen. Marianne Moore [R]Rep. Victoria Morales [D]Rep. Catherine Nadeau [D]Rep. Rena Newell [N]
Rep. Margaret O'Neil [D]Rep. Sarah Pebworth [D]Rep. Ann Peoples [D]Rep. Anne Perry [D]
Rep. Teresa Pierce [D]Rep. William Pluecker [I]Sen. Matthew Pouliot [R]Rep. Lois Galgay Reckitt [D]
Rep. Christina Riley [D]Rep. Walter Riseman [I]Rep. Tiffany Roberts-Lovell [D]Sen. Kimberley Rosen [R]
Rep. Deane Rykerson [D]Sen. Heather Sanborn [D]Sen. Linda Sanborn [D]Rep. John Schneck [D]
Rep. Bettyann Sheats [D]Rep. Stephen Stanley [D]Rep. Paul Stearns [R]Rep. Harold Stewart [R]
Rep. Holly Stover [D]Rep. Scott Strom [R]Rep. Michael Sylvester [D]Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D]
Rep. Denise Tepler [D]Rep. Maureen Terry [D]Rep. Ryan Tipping-Spitz [D]Rep. Ralph Tucker [D]
Sen. Eloise Vitelli [D]Rep. Charlotte Warren [D]Rep. Bruce White [D]Sen. David Woodsome [R]
Rep. Stanley Zeigler [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20HouseCarried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-06-20SenateCARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-05-16SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-05-14HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-14HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-05-08HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-08HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-86).
2019-05-08HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2019-05-08HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2019-05-07SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2019-05-07SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-86).
2019-05-07SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-86) READ and ADOPTED.
2019-05-07SenateREAD ONCE.
2019-05-07SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED.
2019-03-21HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-03-21HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
2019-03-19SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-03-19SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2019-03-19SenateTaken from the table by the President
2019-03-14SenateUnfinished Business
2019-03-12SenateUnfinished Business
2019-03-12SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE
2019-03-12SenateCommittee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback