ME LD1171 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Sustain and Attract Skilled Workers to Maine by Improving the Job Creation Through Educational Opportunity Program
Title
An Act To Sustain and Attract Skilled Workers to Maine by Improving the Job Creation Through Educational Opportunity Program
Sponsors
Sen. Justin Chenette [D] | Rep. Catherine Nadeau [D] | Rep. Rebecca Millett [D] | Rep. Ryan Tipping-Spitz [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #201 (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2017-06-06 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-06 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-151). |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-01 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-01 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2017-06-01 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-151). |
2017-06-01 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-06-01 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-151) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-06-01 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-06-01 | House | On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-01 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Roll Call Number 201 Yeas 18 - Nays 16 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Subsequently The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-05-31 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report, Roll Call Ordered |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senator LANGLEY of Hancock moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-03-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |