ME LD1170 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, to Promote Passenger Rail for Commuters
Title
Resolve, to Promote Passenger Rail for Commuters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-16 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-06-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Reports Read |
2023-06-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-15 | House | On motion of Representative TERRY of Gorham, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-15 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-14 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2023-05-17 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-05-17 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION in concurrence |
2023-03-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-16 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |