ME LD1170 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Failed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Raise the Floor of State Education Funding

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Raise the Floor of State Education Funding

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenatePursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
2019-03-14HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-03-14HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
2019-03-12SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-03-12SenateSubsequently On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS
2019-03-12SenateTaken from the table by the President
2019-03-07SenateUnfinished Business
2019-03-07SenateOn motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE
2019-03-07SenateCommittee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback