ME LD1169 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide Ready Access to Defibrillators in Businesses and Pharmacies
Title
An Act To Provide Ready Access to Defibrillators in Businesses and Pharmacies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #224 (Y: 89 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #251 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #251 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-19 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-19 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to COMMITTING the Bill and accompanying papers to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Bill and accompanying papers COMMITTED to the Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | RECALLED From Governor's Desk pursuant to Joint Order SP 355. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-12 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-11 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-11 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-233). |
2019-06-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-06-11 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-233) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-11 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-06-11 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 224 (Yeas 89 - Nays 52 - Absent 8 - Excused 1 Vacant 1) |
2019-06-11 | House | On motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-11 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-233) |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-233) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-10 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 251 Yeas 21 - Nays 14 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2019-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator DESCHAMBAULT of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator DESCHAMBAULT of York Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-04-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With REFERENCE to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence |
2019-04-16 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-16 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2019-04-16 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2019-04-16 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2019-04-11 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-04 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-02 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-03-28 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-03-28 | House | Later today assigned. |
2019-03-28 | House | On motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford, TABLED pending REFERENCE in concurrence. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Subsequently On motion by Senator BELLOWS of Kennebec The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS suggested and ordered printed |