ME LD1166 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to Allow Sunday Hunting by Landowners on Their Land

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act to Allow Sunday Hunting by Landowners on Their Land

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-07SenatePlaced in Legislative Files (DEAD)
2023-06-07SenateOn motion by Senator LaFOUNTAIN of Kennebec the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence
2023-06-07SenateReports Read
2023-06-06HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-06-06HouseOn motion of Representative LANDRY of Farmington, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
2023-06-06HouseReports READ.
2023-06-02JointReported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM
2023-05-10JointVoted: Divided Report
2023-05-10JointWork Session Held
2023-03-30HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594.
2023-03-21SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE in concurrence
2023-03-16HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-03-16HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE.
2023-03-16HouseCommittee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback