ME LD1164 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Expand the Application Period for Absentee Ballot Requests and Allow Early Processing of Absentee Ballots
Title
An Act To Expand the Application Period for Absentee Ballot Requests and Allow Early Processing of Absentee Ballots
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Bailey [D] | Rep. Seth Berry [D] | Rep. Lydia Crafts [D] | Rep. Traci Gere [D] |
Rep. Tavis Hasenfus [D] | Rep. Grayson Lookner [D] | Rep. Margaret O'Neil [D] | Rep. Laurie Osher [D] |
Rep. Erin Sheehan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-05-12 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2021-04-30 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2021-04-30 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-18 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-03-18 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on March 18, 2021. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1164&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0842&item=1&snum=130 |