ME LD1164 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - TAKEN from the Table by Senator CAIN of Penobscot. PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - TAKEN from the Table by Senator CAIN of Penobscot. PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Allow Cooperative Housing Owners Who Are Blind To Qualify for the Property Tax Exemption
Title
An Act To Allow Cooperative Housing Owners Who Are Blind To Qualify for the Property Tax Exemption
Sponsors
Sen. Seth Goodall [D] | Rep. Andrew Mason [D] | Sen. Emily Cain [D] | Sen. Anne Haskell [D] |
Rep. Ryan Tipping-Spitz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by Senator CAIN of Penobscot. PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator CAIN of Penobscot, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. |
2013-05-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-20 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-05-15 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-15 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-80) |
2013-05-15 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-05-15 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2013-05-15 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-80). |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-80) READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2013-03-26 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-26 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator Haskell of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Committee on TAXATION suggested and ordered printed |