ME LD1162 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Reduce the Incidence of Obesity and Chronic Disease in Maine

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Reduce the Incidence of Obesity and Chronic Disease in Maine

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #531 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-13SenateIn possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
2018-05-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
2018-04-03SenateOn motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2018-04-02HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-04-02HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2018-03-28HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-03-28HouseThe House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-380) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-420) thereto.
2018-03-27SenateSent down for concurrence
2018-03-27SenatePASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-380) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-420) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
2018-03-27SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-380) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-420) thereto ADOPTED
2018-03-27SenateOn motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-420) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-380) READ and ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
2018-03-27SenateUnder further suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator RECONSIDERED whereby The Senate ADOPTED Committee Amendment "A" (S-380)
2018-03-27SenateUnder suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED
2018-03-22HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-03-22HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2018-03-20HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-03-20HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-380).
2018-03-20HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2018-03-20HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-380) was READ and ADOPTED.
2018-03-20HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2018-03-20HouseOn motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2018-03-20HouseReports READ.
2018-03-15SenateSent down for concurrence
2018-03-15SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-380)
2018-03-15SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-380) READ and ADOPTED
2018-03-15SenateREAD ONCE
2018-03-15SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 531 Yeas 32 - Nays 0 - Excused 3 - Absent 0
2018-03-15SenateOn motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
2018-03-15SenateReports Read
2017-08-02HouseCarried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
2017-08-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
2017-03-23HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-03-23HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
2017-03-23SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-03-23SenateREFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2017-03-23SenateCommittee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback