ME LD1154 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase the Betting Limit on Games of Chance at Fairs and Festivals and To Expand Allowed Operation
Title
An Act To Increase the Betting Limit on Games of Chance at Fairs and Festivals and To Expand Allowed Operation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2019-05-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-07 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-07 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-162), in concurrence. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-162) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-04-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-30 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-162). |
2019-04-30 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-04-30 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-03-07 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2019-03-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |