ME LD1143 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Protect Tenants from Unnecessary Evictions
Title
An Act To Protect Tenants from Unnecessary Evictions
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Harnett [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Evangelos [I] | Rep. Christopher Kessler [D] | Rep. Rebecca Millett [D] |
Sen. David Miramant [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-06-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Reports Read |
2021-06-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-15 | House | On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-15 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-15 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2021-05-27 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-27 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-05-11 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-18 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-03-18 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on March 18, 2021. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1143&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0821&item=1&snum=130 |