ME LD1142 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Repeal the Laws Establishing the Cumberland County Recreation Center and To Transfer Authority to Cumberland County
Title
An Act To Repeal the Laws Establishing the Cumberland County Recreation Center and To Transfer Authority to Cumberland County
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Chace [R] | Sen. Benjamin Chipman [D] | Rep. Dale Denno [D] | Rep. Andrew Gattine [D] |
Rep. Erik Jorgensen [D] | Rep. Heather Sirocki [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-31 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-256) in concurrence |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-256) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-05-30 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-30 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-05-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-25 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-256). |
2017-05-25 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-05-25 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-256) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-05-25 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-05-25 | House | On motion of Representative BRYANT of Windham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-25 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT in concurrence |
2017-03-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-23 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2017-03-23 | House | Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed. |