ME LD114 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-31 - (S) Taken from the table by the President Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 23 34 Yeas - 0 Nays- 1 Excused - 0 Absent PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-31 - (S) Taken from the table by the President Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 23 34 Yeas - 0 Nays- 1 Excused - 0 Absent PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Allow Vietnam War Era Veterans To Receive High School Diplomas
Title
An Act To Allow Vietnam War Era Veterans To Receive High School Diplomas
Sponsors
Rep. Bernard Ayotte [R] | Rep. David Cotta [R] | Sen. Jonathan Courtney [R] | Rep. Jarrod Crockett [R] |
Rep. Lance Harvell [R] | Rep. Dennis Keschl [R] | Sen. Thomas Saviello [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-31 | (S) Taken from the table by the President Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 23 34 Yeas - 0 Nays- 1 Excused - 0 Absent PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2011-03-31 | (S) On motion by Senator COURTNEY of York Roll Call Requested On motion by Same Senator Tabled Later Today Assigned pending ENACTMENT Unfinished Business | |
2011-03-31 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-03-31 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-03-29 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-24) in concurrence | |
2011-03-29 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence READ ONCE Committee Amendment "A" (H-24) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-24) | |
2011-03-23 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2011-01-20 | (S) On motion by Senator Langley of Hancock, REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2011-01-20 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-01-20 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. | |
2011-01-20 | (H) Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |