ME LD114 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-13 - (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-13 - (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Summary
An Act To Amend the Laws Regarding Overnight Parking of Recreational Vehicles
Title
An Act To Amend the Laws Regarding Overnight Parking of Recreational Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-13 | (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | |
2009-05-13 | (S) On motion by Senator BRANNIGAN of Cumberland Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence (Remarks Made) Roll Call # 74 34 Yeas - 0 Nays- 0 Excused - 1 Absent | |
2009-05-13 | (S) Subsequently Taken from the table by the President | |
2009-05-13 | (S) On motion by Senator BARTLETT of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending Motion by Senator BRANNIGAN of Cumberland to ACCEPT Minority Ought Not To Pass Report in concurrence | |
2009-05-13 | (S) Senator BRANNIGAN of Cumberland moved to Accept Minority Ought Not To Pass Report in concurrence Roll Call Ordered | |
2009-05-13 | (S) Reports READ | |
2009-05-12 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-12 | (H) On motion of Representative PERRY of Calais, the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2009-05-12 | (H) Subsequently, Representative PERRY of Calais WITHDREW her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. | |
2009-05-12 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2009-05-07 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-06 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-06 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2009-05-06 | (H) On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. | |
2009-05-06 | (H) Representative PERRY of Calais moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. | |
2009-05-06 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2009-02-05 | (S) On motion by Senator BRANNIGAN of Cumberland The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED To REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES | |
2009-02-03 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-02-03 | (H) In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. | |
2009-02-03 | (H) Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. | |
2009-02-03 | (H) On motion of Representative PINGREE of North Haven, the House RECEDED. | |
2009-02-03 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2009-01-29 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-01-27 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-01-21 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-01-21 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2009-01-21 | (H) On motion of Representative CLEARY of Houlton, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION. | |
2009-01-15 | (S) Sent down for concurrence | |
2009-01-15 | (S) On motion by Senator Brannigan of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on NATURAL RESOURCES and ordered printed In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2009-01-13 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-01-13 | (H) On motion of Representative PERRY of Calais, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on BUSINESS, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. | |
2009-01-13 | (H) Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed. |