ME LD1134 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing Nursing Facilities To Permit Nurse Practitioners, Clinical Nurse Specialists and Physician Assistants To Perform Certain Physician Tasks
Title
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing Nursing Facilities To Permit Nurse Practitioners, Clinical Nurse Specialists and Physician Assistants To Perform Certain Physician Tasks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2017-05-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-31 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-31 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2017-05-30 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-30 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-258) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-144) thereto. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-258) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-144) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-258) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-144) thereto ADOPTED |
2017-05-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin Senate Amendment "A" (S-144) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-258) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-258) READ |
2017-05-25 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Report ACCEPTED |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-05-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of Report |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Report READ |
2017-05-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. |
2017-05-24 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-258). |
2017-05-24 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-05-24 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2017-03-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-23 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2017-03-23 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |