ME LD1133 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on June 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Regarding Access to Appropriate Residential Services for Individuals Being Discharged from Psychiatric Hospitalization

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Regarding Access to Appropriate Residential Services for Individuals Being Discharged from Psychiatric Hospitalization

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-09 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #723 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-07-09 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #704 (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-09Senatein concurrence
2018-07-09SenateLD 1133 In Senate, July 9, 2018, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 33 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
2018-07-09HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-07-09HouseROLL CALL NO. 704V 142 having voted in the affirmative and 2 in the negative, with 7 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted.
2018-07-09HouseThis Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
2018-06-20SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
2018-06-20SenateOn Motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
2018-05-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
2018-04-18SenateOn motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2018-04-17HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-04-17HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2018-04-17SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2018-04-17SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-760), in concurrence.
2018-04-17SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-760) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2018-04-17SenateREAD ONCE.
2018-04-17SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2018-04-13HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-04-13HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-760).
2018-04-13HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2018-04-13HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2017-08-02HouseCarried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
2017-08-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
2017-03-28SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence
2017-03-23HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-03-23HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
2017-03-23HouseCommittee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback