ME LD1125 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Subsequently FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Subsequently FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Require Reimbursement for Bed-hold Days in Adult Family Care Homes
Title
Resolve, To Require Reimbursement for Bed-hold Days in Adult Family Care Homes
Sponsors
Sen. Jeffrey Timberlake [R] | Sen. Russell Black [R] | Sen. Ned Claxton [D] | Sen. Lisa Keim [R] |
Sen. Marianne Moore [R] | Rep. Joshua Morris [R] | Rep. Anne Perry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | Senate | Subsequently FINALLY PASSED in concurrence |
2019-06-19 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence. |
2019-05-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-23 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-05-21 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-21 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-103). |
2019-05-21 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-05-21 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-103). |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-103) READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2019-03-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |