ME LD1113 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Direct the Permanent Commission on the Status of Racial, Indigenous and Maine Tribal Populations To Study and Propose Solutions to Disparities in Access to Prenatal Care in the State
Title
Resolve, To Direct the Permanent Commission on the Status of Racial, Indigenous and Maine Tribal Populations To Study and Propose Solutions to Disparities in Access to Prenatal Care in the State
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #255 (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-10 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-06-09 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-09 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-116) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-159) thereto. |
2021-06-09 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-09 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-116) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-159) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2021-06-09 | House | Senate Amendment "A" (S-159) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-116) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-09 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-116) was READ. |
2021-06-09 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-09 | House | On motion of Representative MEYER of Eliot, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-09 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-116) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-159) thereto |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-116) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-159) thereto ADOPTED |
2021-06-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland Senate Amendment "A" (S-159) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-116) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-116) READ |
2021-06-08 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 255 Yeas 21 - Nays 11 - Excused 3 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator CLAXTON of Androscoggin The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-116) Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator CLAXTON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-05-25 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/OTP-AM |
2021-04-13 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-04-13 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on March 18, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |