ME LD1098 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Help Small Employers by Making the Minimum Wage Increase More Gradual in Nonurban Areas
Title
An Act To Help Small Employers by Making the Minimum Wage Increase More Gradual in Nonurban Areas
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Keim [R] | Rep. Robert Alley [D] | Sen. Stacey Guerin [R] | Sen. Marianne Moore [R] |
Rep. Stephen Stanley [D] | Sen. Harold Stewart [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #49 (Y: 87 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #45 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #45 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2019-04-18 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-18 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 49 (Yeas 87 - Nays 53 - Absent 9 - Excused 1 Vacant 1) |
2019-04-18 | House | On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-04-18 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 45 Yeas 21 - Nays 14 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-11 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report, |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senator BELLOWS of Kennebec moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-03-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |