ME LD1094 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Increase Funding for the Child Welfare Services Ombudsman Program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Increase Funding for the Child Welfare Services Ombudsman Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-19HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-19HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-19HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-19HouseThe House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-180) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-336) thereto.
2019-06-19SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-06-19SenatePASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-180) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-336) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
2019-06-19SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-180) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-336) thereto ADOPTED
2019-06-19SenateOn further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-336) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-180) READ and ADOPTED
2019-06-19SenateUnder further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-180) was ADOPTED
2019-06-19SenateUnder suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-180)
2019-06-19SenateOn Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
2019-06-05SenateOn motion by Senator SANBORN, L. of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-05HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-05HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-04HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-04HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-180).
2019-06-04HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2019-06-04HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2019-06-03SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2019-06-03SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-180).
2019-06-03SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-180) READ and ADOPTED.
2019-06-03SenateREAD ONCE.
2019-06-03SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED.
2019-03-05HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-03-05HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
2019-03-05SenateCommittee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback