ME LD1085 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-07 - LD 1085 In Senate, June 7, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 35 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-07 - LD 1085 In Senate, June 7, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 35 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Requirements for Licensure as an Independent Practice Dental Hygienist
Title
An Act To Amend the Requirements for Licensure as an Independent Practice Dental Hygienist
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #239 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #237 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #237 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-07 | Senate | LD 1085 In Senate, June 7, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 35 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2017-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-06 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 237V 145 having voted in the affirmative and 1 in the negative, with 4 being absent, and 1 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2017-06-06 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2017-05-23 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2017-05-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-18 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-18 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-119), in concurrence. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-119) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2017-05-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-09 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-119). |
2017-05-09 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-05-09 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-03-21 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT in concurrence |
2017-03-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-21 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2017-03-21 | House | Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed. |