ME LD108 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve Public Safety by Repealing the Single-use Plastic Carry-out Bag Ban
Title
An Act To Improve Public Safety by Repealing the Single-use Plastic Carry-out Bag Ban
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #137 (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #31 (Y: 81 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #31 (Y: 81 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 137 Yeas 24 - Nays 11 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Reports Read |
2021-04-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 31 (Yeas 81 - Nays 63 - Absent 7 - Excused 0) |
2021-04-28 | House | On motion of Representative TUCKER of Brunswick, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-04-28 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-03-30 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-03 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-03-03 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-01-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-01-11 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on January 11, 2021. |