ME LD1078 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Promote Traffic Safety in Emergency Situations
Title
An Act To Promote Traffic Safety in Emergency Situations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-04-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-04-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2021-04-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-04-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2021-04-22 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP |
2021-04-14 | Joint | Voted: OTP |
2021-04-14 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-11 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |