ME LD1078 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Regarding the Number of Agency Liquor Store Licenses Permitted in a Municipality

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Regarding the Number of Agency Liquor Store Licenses Permitted in a Municipality

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-04-18HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-18HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-04-16SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2019-04-16SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-96), in concurrence.
2019-04-16SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-96) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2019-04-16SenateREAD ONCE.
2019-04-16SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2019-04-16HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-16HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-96).
2019-04-16HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2019-04-16HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2019-03-05SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
2019-03-05HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-03-05HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
2019-03-05HouseCommittee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback