ME LD1073 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Establishing the Commission To Research Effective Strategies and Efficiencies of Legislatures
Title
Resolve, Establishing the Commission To Research Effective Strategies and Efficiencies of Legislatures
Sponsors
Sen. Harold Stewart [R] | Rep. Kyle Bailey [D] | Sen. Richard Bennett [R] | Sen. Jeffrey Timberlake [R] |
Rep. Bruce White [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-17 - House - Adopt Sas-333 To Cas-199 RC #361 (Y: 15 N: 121 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-06-30 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2021-06-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-30 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-06-30 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2021-06-30 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-30 | House | On motion of Representative BAILEY of Gorham, the House RECEDED AND CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-199) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-333) thereto. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-06-30 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate INSISTED To Accept the Report AND the Bill PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-199) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-333) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2021-06-18 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-18 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2021-06-18 | House | RELEASED. |
2021-06-18 | House | HELD. |
2021-06-17 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-199). |
2021-06-17 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-17 | House | Subsequently, Committee Amendment "A" (S-199) was ADOPTED. |
2021-06-17 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 361 (Yeas 15 - Nays 121 - Absent 15 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-17 | House | and FAILED ADOPTION. |
2021-06-17 | House | Senate Amendment "A" (S-333) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-199) was READ |
2021-06-17 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-199) was READ. |
2021-06-17 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-17 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-199) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-333) thereto |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-199) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-333) thereto ADOPTED |
2021-06-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator BALDACCI of Penobscot Senate Amendment "A" (S-333) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-199) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-199) READ |
2021-06-16 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Report Accepted |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator BALDACCI of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of the Report |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Report READ |
2021-06-07 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2021-05-17 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-05-12 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-05-03 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-11 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-11 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |