ME LD1070 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Reduce the Number of Domestic Assaults and Suicides By Increasing the Tax on Alcohol
Title
An Act To Reduce the Number of Domestic Assaults and Suicides By Increasing the Tax on Alcohol
Sponsors
Rep. Barbara Cardone [D] | Rep. Richard Farnsworth [D] | Sen. Geoffrey Gratwick [D] | Rep. Allison Hepler [D] |
Rep. David McCrea [D] | Rep. Lois Galgay Reckitt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Subsequently The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION in concurrence |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |
2019-03-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2019-03-05 | House | Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1070&snum=129 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0793&item=1&snum=129 |