ME LD107 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Specify the Qualifications of Electors
Title
RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Specify the Qualifications of Electors
Sponsors
Rep. William Faulkingham [R] | Rep. John Andrews [R] | Rep. Jonathan Connor [R] | Rep. Justin Fecteau [R] |
Rep. Abigail Griffin [R] | Rep. Laurel Libby [R] | Rep. Heidi Sampson [R] | Sen. Harold Stewart [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #16 (Y: 81 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator LUCHINI of Hancock the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Reports Read |
2021-03-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-11 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 16 (Yeas 81 - Nays 64 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) |
2021-03-11 | House | On motion of Representative CAIAZZO of Scarborough, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-03-11 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-03-10 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2021-03-03 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-03-03 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-01-11 | House | The RESOLUTION was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-01-11 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on January 11, 2021. |