ME LD1068 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Restrict Access to Weapons Pursuant to Court Order in Cases of Harassment
Title
An Act To Restrict Access to Weapons Pursuant to Court Order in Cases of Harassment
Sponsors
Sen. Anne Carney [D] | Sen. Catherine Breen [D] | Rep. Victoria Doudera [D] | Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] |
Rep. Samuel Zager [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #709 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2022-04-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-07 | House | On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 709 Yeas 32 - Nays 0 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Reports Read |
2022-04-05 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2022-01-13 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-01-13 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-06-07 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2021-06-04 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2021-04-15 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-04-15 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-11 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |