ME LD1067 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on February 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-16 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on February 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-16 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Institute a State Tax Amnesty Program To Increase General Revenue Collections
Title
An Act To Institute a State Tax Amnesty Program To Increase General Revenue Collections
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Baldacci [D] | Rep. Benjamin Collings [D] | Sen. Glenn Curry [D] | Sen. Troy Jackson [D] |
Rep. Melanie Sachs [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2022-02-10 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2022-02-03 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2022-02-03 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2021-05-27 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2021-04-27 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-11 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Committee on TAXATION suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on TAXATION Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1067&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0335&item=1&snum=130 |