ME LD1057 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Streamline the Eviction Process
Title
An Act To Streamline the Eviction Process
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Insist RC #116 (Y: 88 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Acc Report 'b' Ontp RC #99 (Y: 84 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Acc Report 'b' Ontp RC #99 (Y: 84 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2019-05-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook The Senate INSISTED To Acceptance of Report A Ought to Pass AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-05-23 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-23 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 116 (Yeas 88 - Nays 50 - Absent 10 - Excused 2 Vacant 1) |
2019-05-23 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of REPORT B Ought Not to Pass . |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-05-21 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Subsequently Report A Ought to Pass ACCEPTED |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-16 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT Report A Ought to Pass , In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin moved to ACCEPT Report A Ought to Pass . |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-05-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-14 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 99 (Yeas 84 - Nays 55 - Absent 9 - Excused 2 Vacant 1) |
2019-05-14 | House | On motion of Representative BAILEY of Saco, REPORT B Ought Not to Pass was ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-14 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence |
2019-03-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2019-03-05 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |