ME LD1054 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Failed on June 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-15 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Failed on June 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-15 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Prohibit the Maine National Guard from Combat Deployment Absent an Act of the United States Congress
Title
An Act to Prohibit the Maine National Guard from Combat Deployment Absent an Act of the United States Congress
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-15 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #236 (Y: 92 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought Not To Pass Report RC #336 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought Not To Pass Report RC #336 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-15 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2023-06-15 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-15 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 236 (Yeas 92 - Nays 53 - Absent 5 - Excused 1) |
2023-06-15 | House | On motion of Representative SUPICA of Bangor, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-15 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 336 Yeas 34 - Nays 1 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2023-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Reports READ |
2023-06-14 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2023-04-03 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-04-03 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |