ME LD1052 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Protect the Firearm Use and Possession Rights of Maine Citizens during an Emergency
Title
An Act To Protect the Firearm Use and Possession Rights of Maine Citizens during an Emergency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-15 - House - Recede And Concur RC #275 (Y: 65 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #342 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-08 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #186 (Y: 73 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #342 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-08 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #186 (Y: 73 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-06-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate INSISTED To Accept The Minority Ought to Pass Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2021-06-15 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-15 | House | Subsequently, the House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2021-06-15 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 275 (Yeas 65 - Nays 73 - Absent 13 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-15 | House | Motion of Representative ANDREWS of Paris to RECEDE and CONCUR FAILED. |
2021-06-15 | House | Speaker FECTEAU of Biddeford MOVED to INSIST. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-06-14 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2021-06-14 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Subsequently The Minority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 342 Yeas 12 - Nays 23 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator DESCHAMBAULT of York The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report FAILED |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator DESCHAMBAULT of York Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-08 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 186 (Yeas 73 - Nays 70 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-08 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-08 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2021-06-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-03 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-02 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-02 | House | Later today assigned. |
2021-06-02 | House | On motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town, TABLED pending the motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2021-06-02 | House | Representative WARREN of Hallowell moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2021-06-02 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-05-19 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP |
2021-05-07 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-07 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence |
2021-03-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2021-03-11 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |