ME LD1052 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Feed Rural Citizens of the State
Title
An Act To Feed Rural Citizens of the State
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #299 (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - Acc Maj Ought To Pass Rep RC #145 (Y: 79 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - Acc Maj Ought To Pass Rep RC #145 (Y: 79 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2015-06-19 | Senate | The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of Minority OUGHT NOT TO PASS Report , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2015-06-19 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-19 | House | ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 299 27 Yeas - 7 Nays- 1 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED |
2015-06-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President ProTem |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-04 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator, TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending his motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report, in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report, in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2015-06-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-03 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2015-06-03 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2015-06-03 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2015-06-03 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 145 (Yeas 79 - Nays 65 - Absent 7 - Excused 0) |
2015-06-03 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2015-06-03 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2015-06-02 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-01 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-29 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-28 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-27 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-26 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-21 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-21 | House | Later today assigned. |
2015-05-21 | House | On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass Report. |
2015-05-21 | House | Representative GATTINE of Westbrook moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass Report. |
2015-05-21 | House | Reports READ. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator Brakey of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on Health and Human Services, in concurrence. |
2015-03-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-24 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2015-03-24 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |