ME LD1050 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Require Education about African-American History and the History of Genocide

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Require Education about African-American History and the History of Genocide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - House - Enactment RC #222 (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Reconsider RC #162 (Y: 87 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - Acc Min Otp As Amended Rep RC #143 (Y: 48 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #140 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20HouseCarried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-06-20SenateCARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-06-11SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-11HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-11HouseROLL CALL NO. 222 (Yeas 140 - Nays 2 - Absent 7 - Excused 1 Vacant 1)
2019-06-11HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-10SenateOn motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-147) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "B" (H-520) in concurrence
2019-06-07HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-07HouseIn NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
2019-06-07HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-147) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-520) thereto.
2019-06-07HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-06-07HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-147) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-520) thereto was ADOPTED.
2019-06-07HouseSubsequently, On motion of Representative TALBOT ROSS of Portland, House Amendment "B" (H-520) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-147) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-06-07HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2019-06-07HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-07HouseIn NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
2019-06-07HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-147) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-520) thereto.
2019-06-07HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-06-07HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-147) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-520) thereto was ADOPTED.
2019-06-07HouseOn motion of Representative TALBOT ROSS of Portland, House Amendment "B" (H-520) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-147) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-06-07HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-147) was READ.
2019-06-07HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-06-07HouseSubsequently, the Committee Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-06-07HouseSubsequently, Speaker laid before the House
2019-06-07HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2019-06-06HouseUnfinished Business
2019-06-05HouseUnfinished Business
2019-06-04HouseUnfinished Business
2019-06-03HouseUnfinished Business
2019-05-30HouseUnfinished Business
2019-05-30HouseLater today assigned.
2019-05-30HouseOn further motion of same Representative TABLED pending ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-147).
2019-05-30HouseOn further motion of the same Representative the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-147) was ADOPTED.
2019-05-30HouseROLL CALL NO. 162 (Yeas 87 - Nays 54 - Absent 7 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
2019-05-30HouseSubsequently, On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-147).
2019-05-30HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2019-05-30HouseLater today assigned.
2019-05-30HouseOn motion of Representative TALBOT ROSS of Portland, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED.
2019-05-29HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-29HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-147).
2019-05-29HouseSubsequently, under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-05-29HouseSubsequently, Representative HICKMAN of Winthrop WITHDREW his OBJECTION to SUSPENDING THE RULES for the purpose of giving this Bill its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-05-29HouseSubsequently, Representative HICKMAN of Winthrop WITHDREW his motion to TABLE until later in today's session.
2019-05-29HouseThe same Representative moved to TABLE until later in today's session.
2019-05-29HouseRepresentative HICKMAN of Winthrop OBJECTED to SUSPENDING THE RULES for the purpose of giving this Bill its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-05-29HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-147) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-05-29HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-05-29HouseOn further motion of same Representative the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-05-29HouseROLL CALL NO. 143 (Yeas 48 - Nays 94 - Absent 6 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
2019-05-29HouseMotion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report FAILED.
2019-05-29HouseReports READ.
2019-05-28SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-05-28SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-147)
2019-05-28SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-147) READ and ADOPTED
2019-05-28SenateREAD ONCE
2019-05-28SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 140 Yeas 34 - Nays 0 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
2019-05-28SenateOn motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended By Committee Amendment "A" (S-147) Report ACCEPTED.
2019-05-28SenateReports Read
2019-02-28HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-02-28HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
2019-02-28SenateCommittee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback