ME LD1049 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Regarding the Sale of Cats and Dogs with Health Problems

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Regarding the Sale of Cats and Dogs with Health Problems

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-04-30HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-30HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-04-25HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-25HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-52).
2019-04-25HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2019-04-25HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2019-04-23SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2019-04-23SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-52).
2019-04-23SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-52) READ and ADOPTED.
2019-04-23SenateREAD ONCE.
2019-04-23SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED.
2019-02-28HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-02-28HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY.
2019-02-28SenateCommittee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback