ME LD1047 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Create an Alternate Minimum Wage Applicable to Student Employees Who Are under 20 Years of Age and to Employees Who Are under 18 Years of Age
Title
An Act To Create an Alternate Minimum Wage Applicable to Student Employees Who Are under 20 Years of Age and to Employees Who Are under 18 Years of Age
Sponsors
Rep. Shelley Rudnicki [R] | Rep. Danny Costain [R] | Rep. Sheila Lyman [R] | Rep. Joshua Morris [R] |
Rep. Daniel Newman [R] | Rep. Richard Pickett [R] | Rep. Heidi Sampson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #63 (Y: 80 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-06-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-05-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-05-19 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 63 (Yeas 80 - Nays 64 - Absent 7 - Excused 0) |
2021-05-19 | House | On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-05-19 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-05-17 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2021-04-21 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-04-21 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING in concurrence |
2021-03-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING. |
2021-03-11 | House | Committee on Labor and Housing suggested and ordered printed. |