ME LD1046 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to Decriminalize Public Drinking

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act to Decriminalize Public Drinking

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-06HousePlaced in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
2023-06-06HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-06-06HouseOn motion of Representative SALISBURY of Westbrook, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
2023-06-06HouseReports READ.
2023-06-01SenateSent down for concurrence
2023-06-01SenateOn motion by Senator BEEBE-CENTER of Knox the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED.
2023-06-01SenateReports Read
2023-05-30JointReported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM
2023-04-14JointVoted: Divided Report
2023-04-14JointWork Session Held
2023-03-30SenateCARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594.
2023-03-07HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-03-07HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
2023-03-07SenateCommittee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback