ME LD104 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Change the Time and Location of the Annual Meeting of the Board of Trustees of the Kittery Water District
Title
An Act To Change the Time and Location of the Annual Meeting of the Board of Trustees of the Kittery Water District
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-03-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-14 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2017-03-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-02 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2017-03-02 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-03-02 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary. Report Accepted. |
2017-02-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-01-19 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY in concurrence |
2017-01-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-17 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2017-01-17 | House | Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed. |