ME LD1033 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Direct the Department of Inland Fisheries and Wildlife To Examine Sunday Hunting
Title
Resolve, To Direct the Department of Inland Fisheries and Wildlife To Examine Sunday Hunting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED in concurrence |
2021-07-02 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence. |
2021-06-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-03 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-06-03 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-03 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-123). |
2021-06-03 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-03 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-123) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-03 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-03 | House | On motion of Representative LANDRY of Farmington, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-03 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-123) |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-123) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-02 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-05-27 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-17 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-17 | Joint | Work Session Reconsidered |
2021-05-03 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-03 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-10 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |