ME LD1033 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Assist the University of Maine System and the Maine Community College System To Reduce the Need for Remedial Education
Title
Resolve, To Assist the University of Maine System and the Maine Community College System To Reduce the Need for Remedial Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2015-07-21 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. , in concurrence. |
2015-06-30 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. in concurrence |
2015-03-24 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-24 | House | Resolve REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator Langley of Hancock REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS |
2015-03-24 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1033&snum=127 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0359&item=1&snum=127 |